Trustees CENTRAL OXFORD MOSQUE SOCIETY
Charity number: 1029645
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABAS AHMED | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED NAWAZ | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ASLAM DOGAR | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHAHID ALI RANA | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
AJAZ UR REHMAN | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ASHRAF ALI RANA | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
WALAYAT HUSSAIN DOGAR | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Naghman Hussain SECRETARY | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
NAVEED SHAN TREASURER | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
AERF JAN | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
FUWAD CHAUDHARY CHAIRMAN | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
FAISAL AZIZ | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MANAVAR ANWAR VICE CHAIR | Trustee | 03 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.