Trustees SILSOE PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1029828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Debock | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Sahota | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Clark | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Wiley | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kehoe | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abbie Rowley | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Faye Bowers | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.