Trustees GATEWAY FRIENDS
Charity number: 1030348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeanette Jones | Chair | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Farndon | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Rounsley | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather wright | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Crealey | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Evans | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Miles | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Reese | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNN COVINGTON | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA GIBSON | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN BRENNAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.