Trustees THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS SCHOOL
Charity number: 1031172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Denney | Chair | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Heard | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fay Potter | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sanders | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Houlding | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jay Conroy | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denise Sims | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Louise Woollard | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMILY COOPER | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.