Governing document Friends of Wigton Infant School
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1991 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCTOBER 1993 as amended on 15 Nov 2017 as amended on 07 Oct 2020 as amended on 05 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
The object of the association is to advance the education of the pupils in the school by: -developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school -engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.