Governing document A GOOD INDEPENDENT DISABILITIES EDUCATION EMPLOYMENT ADVICE AND ADVOCACY AGENCY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 1993 AS AMENDED 10 JANUARY 1994, 28 FEBRUARY 1995 30 JANUARY, 26 MARCH 1996, 23 OCTOBER 1996, 28 JANUARY 1997, 25 FEBRUARY 1997 AND 24 FEBRUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY. (A) BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVOCACY SERVICE, TO EMPOWER THEM AND TO ENABLE THEM TO MAKE INDEPENDENT DECISIONS AND TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO THE DISABLED, AND THEIR DISABILITIES AND TO THE NEEDS OF THE DISABLED..
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.