Accounts and annual returns WESTFIELDS COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1031955
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 05 November 2019 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 05 November 2019 | 128 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 20 June 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 20 June 2018 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 28 October 2017 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
28 October 2017 | 120 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window