Trustees ST MATTHEW'S HIGH BROOMS PRE SCHOOL
Charity number: 1033642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Monaz Minoo Parry | Chair | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Katy Seedhouse | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Gemma Louise Chalklin | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elizabeth Franklin | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laura Clark | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Gilly Taylor | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Michelle Carter | Trustee | 10 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Young | Trustee | 01 January 2004 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN ARMOUR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.