Trustees 1ST GRUNDISBURGH SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1033767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON BANHAM | Chair | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Vobe | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hewitt | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Catchpole | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Murrill | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN COMBER | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Jo Saagi | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|||||
David Dring | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Walls | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Warren | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel Turner | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Boswell | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zarah Decker | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Brown | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christina Poguntke | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Swain | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JASON BANHAM | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN ADAMS | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Carly Richmond | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP STEBBINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.