Trustees THE PEASLAKE SCHOOLS TRUST
Charity number: 1034412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK FOSTER | Chair |
|
||||||
Jevon Oliver Birchall | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Louise Pride | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Joy Riley | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janette Weller | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Dangerfield | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Southee | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Small | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clayton | Trustee | 29 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS MOIRA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID OLIVER NIGEL NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES COBB | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.