Trustees THE GRIFFINS SOCIETY
Charity number: 1034571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Serena Wright | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Anne Marie Carr | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean O'Neill | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emily Catherine Fei | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Jordan | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Matthews | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CADOGAN | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.