Trustees High Down Schools Parent Staff Association
Charity number: 1034597
Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Cave | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth lung | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sophia Tunstall | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Taylor | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Masheder | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cassie Stone | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Haunton | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.