Governing document LEWISHAM NEXUS SERVICE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND FEBRUARY 1993, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 21ST FEBRUARY 1994 AND 25TH NOVEMBER 2003. as amended on 12 Aug 2020 as amended on 01 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, INCLUDING LEARNING DISABILITIES, WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS, ILLNESS OR DISABILITY, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LEWISHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.