Trustees THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION - SHROPSHIRE COUNTY
Charity number: 1035091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Griffiths | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Fancett | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hurst | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Gray | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Mitchell | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Harding | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Taylor | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Myers | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Coleman | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Smith-Roe | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.