Trustees FARNBOROUGH NEIGHBOURCARE
Charity number: 1035157
Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS TERRI WILLCOCKS | Chair | 01 December 2006 |
|
|
||||
David John Lewis | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert House | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Leonard Courtney | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Giles Chapman | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ketteringham | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH WILLIAM THORP | Trustee | 05 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANNE GROOCOCK | Trustee | 05 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WESTLAKE | Trustee | 01 April 1998 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.