Trustees THE NATIONAL YOUTH AGENCY
Charity number: 1035804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Anne Stone | Chair | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hubbard | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Breda Leyne | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Kaye | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Chery | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amma Anderson | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Watson | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Carr | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Victoria Renshaw | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK NORRIS | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gabriel Buck | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLLR KEN MEESON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.