Trustees 1ST WHITWELL (OPEN) SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP
Charity number: 1036062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THEO LOUISE PATTERSON | Chair | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Ellis | Trustee | 10 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Lawrence | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lawrence | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Ellis | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Artus | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karl Austin | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
THEO ADELE WEBSTER | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE LOUISE POLLARD | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ELLIS | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.