Trustees THE SUTTON COLDFIELD U3A
Charity number: 1037540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Chappell | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen David Lewis | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Rhiannon Goddard | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Scott | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hopkins | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Anne Darby | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sawyer | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bailey | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Soper | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LISSAMAN | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Will Wheeler | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.