Governing document ACORN CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Charity number: 1039535
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/03/1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24/06/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22/07/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS RESIDENT OVERSEAS TO RELIEVE SICKNESS TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN PARTICULAR PROVIDING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CHESTERFIELD UK AND OVERSEAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.