Governing document SOUTH YORKSHIRE BADGER GROUP
Charity number: 1039884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1985 AND AMENDED 17 JULY 1994, 10 APRIL 2002, 30 JANUARY 2007 AND 31 JANUARY 2008 as amended on 27 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE, CONSERVATION, STUDY, MONITORING AND RECORDING OF BADGERS IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND TO UNDERTAKE ANY ACTIVITY WHICH WILL ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS ABOUT BADGERS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.