Trustees 3RD AYLESBURY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1040760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Buckland | Chair | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABI PARRY | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey House | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Thomas | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Noone | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Baldwin | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Louisa Pinnell | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Katie Leighton | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Vaughan | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Maria Elwin | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Sarah Eddy | Trustee | 14 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Murray Thomas Dobbie | Trustee | 01 April 1997 |
|
|
||||
SKYE ELWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON Mitchell | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.