Governing document HOLBROOK SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1041483
Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22 NOVEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED ON 12 SEPTEMBER 1994, 29 MARCH 1995 AND 1 MAY 1995 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE-THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.