Trustees WITNEY MUSIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1041940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher George Sawyers | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Bolton | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Finch | Trustee | 22 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Barber | Trustee | 22 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Milner | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Vanessa Schmidt | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Louise Scott | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jean Marjorie Richards | Trustee | 24 June 2008 |
|
|||||
Professor Ian Neary | Trustee | 21 June 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.