Trustees 1ST CREDITON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1043624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Whetton | Chair | 12 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Edlin-Benwell | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Thompson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rosemary Olsson | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stella Marie Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Fay Page | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hollie April Saunders | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lana Noon | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.