Trustees ANGLO DUTCH MIGRAINE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1044398
Charity reporting is up to date (196 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jitka Vanderpol | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tijman Balvers | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Callum Duncan | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor FAYYAZ AHMED | Trustee | 14 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Hans Carpay | Trustee | 31 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manjit Matharu | Trustee | 31 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr EMILE COUTURIER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.