Trustees ODYSSEY PROJECT LIMITED
Charity number: 1045259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Robert Chandler | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Scott | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lynn Clark | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Jane Evans | Trustee | 03 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janette Ann Hannon | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon McCalla | Trustee | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.