Trustees CLIFTON CAMPVILLE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1046105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Moore | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Bryan | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Mary Burrows | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Burrows | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Caroline Howard | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ann Bird | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ellis | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Mahony | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev John William Rupert Grice | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Julie Smale | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Green | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Arnold Lodge | Trustee | 05 July 2004 |
|
|||||
Vaughan Andrew Taylor | Trustee | 02 August 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.