Accounts and annual returns DEEPING ST JAMES COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1046301
Charity reporting is overdue by 433 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 67 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 67 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 November 2023 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 433 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2021
(These accounts |
22 March 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2020
(These accounts |
22 March 2022 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 February 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
06 February 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window