Governing document CANINE EPILEPSY SUPPORT GROUP
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED ON THE 10 NOVEMBER 1996 & 26 MAY 2002 AND 16 MAY 2004, AS AMENDED ON 17TH APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING FOR PERSONS IN DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR OWNERSHIP OF ANIMALS SUFFERING FROM EPILEPSY. 2.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN UNDERSTANDING THE FORMS OF MANAGEMENT AND TREATMENT OF EPILEPSY IN ANIMALS. 3. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST ANIMALS SUFFERING FROM EPILEPSY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.