Trustees CORNERSTONE CHRISTIAN CENTRE - GROVE
Charity number: 1046923
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Celia Louise Terrill | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean McVeigh | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Colquhoun Morgan | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Sharon Culley | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy McEwen | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jones | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MIRANDA CLAIRE HAWKINS | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Susan Rance | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.