Trustees Needingworth Village Hall Trust
Charity number: 1047395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Williams | Chair | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Vincent Dobbyne | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ellen Killock | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Trevor Hebert | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET FOUNTAIN | Trustee | 19 May 2005 |
|
|
||||
ROY JOHN FOUNTAIN | Trustee | 20 November 2003 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.