Trustees Point North Community Foundation
Charity number: 1047625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Chinhengo | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Joanna Margaret Barker MBE | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Peter William John Locke | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Ruth O'Rourke | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Catharine Glover | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rebecca Armstrong | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Emily Burns | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Ann Dolphin OBE | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||
James Mark Featherstone Fenwick | Trustee | 13 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Hall | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Prof Ray Hudson | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.