Trustees COELIAC UK
Charity number: 1048167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Agnes Burnside | Chair | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kate Denham | Trustee | 20 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Sheffield | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Davis | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive David HART | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jonathan Dilloway | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence David Broadie | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aishah Farooq | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gerard George Robins | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Maxine Valmas | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anita Patel | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof Alan Christopher Perkins | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.