Trustees FRIENDS OF ST. MICHAEL'S, STEWKLEY
Charity number: 1049311
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry Turnbull | Chair | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Vale | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Anna Louise Boonstra | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Towse | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Pierce | Trustee | 16 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.