Trustees Berkshire Healthcare Charity
Charity number: 1049733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN EARWICKER | Chair | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tehmeena Ajmal | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rajiv Gatha | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Scott Gray | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Carol Feeney | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Fulton | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Coxwell | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK DAY | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR Minocher Irani | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nighat Mehmuda Mian | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
BERKSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEX GILD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIAN MARK EMMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.