Accounts and annual returns HEDDON ON THE WALL FIRST SCHOOL P T A
Charity number: 1049836
Charity reporting is overdue by 1141 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 45 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 45 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 411 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 411 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 776 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 776 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1141 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1141 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window