Governing document TROWBRIDGE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 SEPTEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 29 MARCH 1995 AND FURTHER AMENDED 24 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED ON 22 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC ORCHESTRAL CONCERTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE TROWBRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.