Governing document WOKINGHAM UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/09/1995 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/1995 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2005 AS AMENDED ON 16/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 30 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE WOKINGHAM AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.