Trustees ST CATHERINE'S PRE-SCHOOL GROUP
Charity number: 1050009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Bonfield | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Lou Austin | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madeline Winters | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Dixon | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Marley | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Smith | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Blogg | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Osment | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Rooney | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Heaton Livingstione | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Gibbs | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Gibbs | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Middleton | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Burt | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.