Trustees 2ND HORSHAM SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1050198
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul FELGATE | Chair | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleri RYLEY | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian TURRELL | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony HIGGS | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jon COTTON | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Howell | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trish Evans | Trustee | 03 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline McCurrach | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Frank Ramsay | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER RUPERT PELBROUGH SMITH | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.