Governing document DISABILITY SHOOTING GREAT BRITAIN
Charity number: 1050338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 JUN 1995 AS AMENDED ON 19 AUG 1995 AS AMENDED ON 09 OCT 1995 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF THE DISABLED IN PARTICULAR PARAPLEGICS AND TETRAPLEGICS BY THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE SPORT OF PARAPLEGIC AND WHEELCHAIR SHOOTING.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GREAT BRITAIN
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.