Trustees HIGHBRIDGE COMMUNITY HALL TRUST
Charity number: 1050379
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARIE PARSONS Mrs | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Woodsford | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adele Marie Stevens | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Coull | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Wright | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadia McDevitt | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Atyeo | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rita Mary Lawrence | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA BURGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET ANITA KEEN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.