Trustees MIDHURST U3A
Charity number: 1051113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Odette Hillary Marshall | Chair | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John White | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hazel Edwards | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Beatrice Barre | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeannine Marie Murphy | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stanley Woodhams | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Claire Holland | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN BRINSON | Trustee | 28 June 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.