Trustees ROSES THEATRE TRUST
Charity number: 1051708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Rowe | Chair | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Grace Fidlschuster | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Baalam | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Cody | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Teasdale | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Gran | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nichols Wilkes | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin Smith | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL NICHOLAS JOHNSON | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.