Governing document BARNTON COMMUNITY NURSERY AND PRIMARY SCHOOL FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 1988,14 SEPTEMBER 1994,17 JANUARY 1996. AS AMENDED ON 01/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED,IN PRACTICE CHESHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.