Governing document VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN - DEVON
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/03/1996 AS AMENDED ON 11/05/1998 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/1999 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 07/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 04/06/2013 as amended on 22 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS IN DEVON AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.