Trustees FLEET & DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1055104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GRANT GAWTHORPE | Chair | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
michael kennett Brown | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SUSAN OPENSHAW | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Van Klaveren | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN GROSVENOR | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ANNE REDMAN | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Teagle | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Morley | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Joan Jones | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Rees Jones | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paddy Powell | Trustee | 02 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Fiona Frances Godfrey | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.