Accounts and annual returns 2ND CROMER GUIDES
Charity number: 1057200
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 09 January 2011 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 09 January 2011 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 31 January 2011 | 457 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 21 September 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 09 May 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window