Trustees PEOPLE FIRST (SELF ADVOCACY)
Charity number: 1057354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE SPOONER | Chair | 19 April 2019 |
|
|||||
kweku aswin wilson | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATE BRACKLEY | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BELLA FRANCESCA EDWARDS | Trustee | 18 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marie Emma Claire | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PAUL ELLIFFE | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BRIAN BROOKSTEIN | Trustee | 19 April 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.