Trustees COLCHESTER AND TENDRING YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE LTD
Charity number: 1058420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Ann Williams | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Helen Milgate | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Josephine Bain | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Caroline Taylor | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Mathias | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Wambui Wainaina | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Strangward | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.